McCune v. Bahala Na Multi Style Hawaii Club #1 LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Kirk McCune
Defendant: Alejandro Marana, Dexter Labonog and Bahala Na Multi Style Hawaii Club #1 LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00286
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 14 EO: To allow Plaintiff additional time to serve Defendant Dexter Labonog, the Court CONTINUES the 09/24/2018 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to 09:30 AM on 10/29/2018 in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield1)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendants Bahala Na Multi Style Hawaii Club #1 LLC and Alejandro Marana re ECF No. #12 Request for Entry of Default. (emt, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION REQUEST for Entry of Default Against Defendants Bahala Na Multi Style Hawaii Club #1 LLC and Alejandro Marana Brett R. Tobin appearing for Plaintiff Kirk McCune (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brett R. Tobin, #2 Entry of Default Against Defendants Bahala Na Multi Style Hawaii Club #1 LLC and Alejandro Marana)(Tobin, Brett) Modified on 8/29/2018 (emt, ).
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kirk McCune. Alejandro Marana. (Tobin, Brett)
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kirk McCune. Bahala Na Multi Style Hawaii Club #1 LLC. (Tobin, Brett)
July 30, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #1 Complaint and #3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark was mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on July 30, 2018. (emt, )
July 27, 2018 Filing 8 Summons in a Civil Action - ISSUED as to All Defendants. (afc)
July 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form to Consent) (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). *** The party filing the case is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice of Assignment and the attached Election Form.
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 9/24/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/27/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00286-KJM on all further pleadings. (afc)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Kirk McCune re Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark Kirk McCune. (Tobin, Brett)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Kirk McCune. (Tobin, Brett)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement, Dilution, Unfair Competition, and Unjust Enrichment against Bahala Na Multi Style Hawaii Club #1 LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2066402.), filed by Kirk McCune. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons)(Tobin, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCune v. Bahala Na Multi Style Hawaii Club #1 LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk McCune
Represented By: Brett R. Tobin
Represented By: Dylan J. H. Taschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Marana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Labonog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bahala Na Multi Style Hawaii Club #1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?