Ward v. Whitmore Super Market, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Daniel Ward
Defendant: Manabu Matsumoto, Greg Matsumoto and Whitmore Super Market, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00296
Filed: August 5, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
0 Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
1 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 16 Featured Case RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 10/1/2018. (emt, )
October 1, 2018 15 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Discussion held regarding possible resolution of this case. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09/30/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 08/20/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 06/28/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 05/01/2019. Discovery due by 08/02/2019. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:35 - 9:40.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 27, 2018 14 Scheduling Conference Statement for Plaintiff. (Phillips, Lunsford)
September 21, 2018 13 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Whitmore Super Market, Ltd..(Wong, Thomas)
September 21, 2018 12 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Wong, Thomas)
September 18, 2018 11 Summons Issued as to Whitmore Super Market, Ltd. (emt, )
September 17, 2018 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Whitmore Super Market, Ltd., filed by Daniel Ward. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons)(Phillips, Lunsford)
September 13, 2018 9 STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO NAME WHITMORE SUPER MARKET, LTD. AS THE DEFENDANT AND FOR DISMISSAL OF PREJUDICE OF GREGG MATSUMOTO AND MANABU MATSUMOTO re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 9/13/2018. Motions terminated: #8 EX PARTE Motion filed by Manabu Matsumoto, Greg Matsumoto. Whitmore Super Market, Ltd. added. Greg Matsumoto and Manabu Matsumoto terminated. (emt, )
September 11, 2018 8 EX PARTE Motion Thomas J. Wong appearing for Defendants Greg Matsumoto, Manabu Matsumoto (Wong, Thomas)
September 4, 2018 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Greg Matsumoto, Manabu Matsumoto.(Wong, Thomas)
August 9, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Ward. Manabu Matsumoto served on 8/8/2018. (emt, )
August 6, 2018 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
August 6, 2018 4 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/1/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 6, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
August 6, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00296 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2070454.), filed by Daniel Ward. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Phillips, Lunsford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Whitmore Super Market, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ward
Represented By: Lunsford D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manabu Matsumoto
Represented By: Thomas J. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Matsumoto
Represented By: Thomas J. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitmore Super Market, Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas J. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?