Schnabel Foundation Company v. Sompo America Insurance Services LLC

Plaintiff: Schnabel Foundation Company
Defendant: Sompo America Insurance Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00300
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
0 Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
1 Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 10/1/2018. Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties and their lead counsel are hereby ORDERED TO APPEAR before the undersigned on July 10, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. (emt, )
October 1, 2018 20 Featured Case RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 10/1/2018. (emt, )
October 1, 2018 19 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 10/1/2018. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 10/15/2019 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/3/2019 at 09:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference is set for 7/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference statements by 7/03/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/15/2019. Discovery due by 8/16/2019. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:00 a.m. - 9:10 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
September 24, 2018 18 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Tilker, Brian)
September 24, 2018 17 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chang, Corlis)
September 24, 2018 16 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chang, Corlis)
September 21, 2018 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sompo America Insurance Services LLC. (Rask, Erik)
September 21, 2018 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Sompo America Insurance Services LLC.(Tilker, Brian)
September 5, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00300-JAO-RLP on all further pleadings . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 09/05/2018. (apg, dist)
August 13, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING The Application Of Richard Kalson To Appear Pro Hac Vice re #11 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 8/13/2018. (cib, )
August 10, 2018 ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the docket number #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by Schnabel Foundation Company shall be submitted by e-mail to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi(puglisi_orders@hid.uscourts.gov) for consideration. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations, LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (cib, )
August 10, 2018 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2073255.Corlis J. Chang appearing for Plaintiff Schnabel Foundation Company (Chang, Corlis)
August 9, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Schnabel Foundation Company. Sompo America Insurance Services LLC. (Chang, Corlis)
August 8, 2018 9 Summons Issued as to Sompo America Insurance Services LLC. (cib, )
August 7, 2018 8 Summons (Proposed) (Chang, Corlis)
August 7, 2018 7 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Schnabel Foundation Company. (Chang, Corlis)
August 6, 2018 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
August 6, 2018 5 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
August 6, 2018 4 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/1/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/6/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 6, 2018 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00300-LEK-RLP on all further pleadings. (afc)
August 6, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schnabel Foundation Companhy. (Chang, Corlis)
August 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Sompo America Insurance Services, LLC Schnabel Foundation Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2071080.), filed by Schnabel Foundation Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chang, Corlis) Docket text entry modified on 8/6/2018 to include identifying each exhibit. (afc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schnabel Foundation Company v. Sompo America Insurance Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sompo America Insurance Services LLC
Represented By: Erik Andrew Rask
Represented By: Brian W. Tilker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schnabel Foundation Company
Represented By: Corlis J. Chang
Represented By: Richard Kalson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?