Kimble v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Donna S. Kimble
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00301
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: ALAN C KAY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edric Ming-Kai Ching on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Ching, Edric)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 Clerk's Letter addressed to Diane C. Haar, Esq., attorney for plaintiff re: Transmission of documentation and forms for service relative to the Order granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis #7 . Service of letter and documentation via first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (afc)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re: #3 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/13/2018. (afc)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (afc)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE ALAN C. KAY and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00301-ACK-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Diane C. Haar appearing for Plaintiff Donna S. Kimble (Haar, Diane)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Haar, Diane)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Donna S. Kimble against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Donna S. Kimble. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haar, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimble v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna S. Kimble
Represented By: Diane C. Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?