Char v. Simeona et al

Plaintiff: Mark Alan Char
Defendant: Lugene Simeona, Toy Stech, Louis M. Kealoha, City and County of Honolulu and Defendants 1-100
Interested Party: Laurie Nadamoto, Shelley Nobriga and Shelley Harrington
Case Number: 1:2018cv00303
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
0 Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
1 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 6 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Mark Alan Char. (emt, )
October 4, 2018 5 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded; Stay Pending Trial against Lugene Simeona, Toy Stech, Defendants 1-100 - filed by Mark Alan Char. Mailing Documentation was not retained. (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2018: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, ). Modified on 10/5/2018 to attach photocopy of mailing envelope. Note: Portions of the sender's address are not visible, docketing is unable to locate the original envelope. (emt, ).
September 10, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/10/2018. (1) The Complaint is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a colorable claim for relief. (2) Char may file an amended complaint on or before October 12, 2018. Failure to file an amended complaint by October 12, 2018 may result in dismissal of this action with prejudice. (3) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Char a prisoner civil rights complaint form so that he may comply with this Order. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Mark Alan Char served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 10, 2018. A copy of the Court's Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form and instructions shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Char.
August 27, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #3 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION has been served by First Class Mail to Mark Alan Char to the address of record on August 27, 2018. Additionally, a copy of the order has been served by First Class Mail to the Warden of Oahu Community Correctional Center at Oahu Community Correctional Center, 2199 Kamehameha Hwy, Honolulu, HI 96819. The Financial Department for the U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii, Department of Public Safety Litigation Coordinators Shelley Nobriga Harrington, Esq. and Laurie Nadamoto, Esq. received the document electronically at the e-mail addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
August 27, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re #2 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 8/27/2018. (emt, )
August 7, 2018 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Mark Alan Char. (emt, )
August 7, 2018 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded; Stay Pending Trial against All Defendants - filed by Mark Alan Char. (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2018: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Char v. Simeona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lugene Simeona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toy Stech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis M. Kealoha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Nobriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Alan Char
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?