Kulik v. United States et al

Petitioner: Dorothy Kulik
Respondent: State of Hawaii, County of Kauai and United States
Case Number: 1:2018cv00306
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Kauai
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/4/2018. (afc)Plaintiff is granted until October 2, 2018 to file an amended complaint that attempts to cure the deficiencies set forth in the order. Failure to file a amended complaint by October 2, 2018 will result in automatic dismissal of this action. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE A copy of the instant order will be served with a copy of "Pro Se 15" form, the Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Non-Prisoner) and served on September 4, 2018 by First Class Mail addressed to Dorothy Kulik at her address of record.
August 13, 2018 8 LETTER: Courtesy copy of letter with enclosures provided to the Clerk of Court from plaintiff Dorothy Kulik. (Attachments: #1 Mailing documentation) Letter addressed to Respondents and Austin FBI: "Enclosed please find a conformed copy of the first page of my Motion for Leave to File Petition, and Complaint and Request for Injunction and Mandamus; Motion for Emergency Preliminary Injunctions and Mandamus and Temporary Restraining Order Pending FBI Investigations; and Rule 5.1 notices to the USAG and the Hawaii AG. I can't afford to reproduce these documents in their entirety again. Therefore, please replace the first page of each document with the enclosed conformed copies and conform the rest of each document accordingly." (afc)
August 8, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER (1) GRANTING IFP APPLICATION #3 ; AND (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #2 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/8/2018. (afc) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 7, 2018 6 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/15/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memorandum re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/7/2018. COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 7, 2018 5 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge of Statutes and Constitutional Article; Certificate of Service - filed by Dorothy Kulik. (afc)
August 7, 2018 4 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge of Statutes and Constitutional Amendment; Certificate of Service - filed by Dorothy Kulik. (afc)
August 7, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Dorothy Kulik. (afc)STAFF NOTATION: The document, styled as an Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, was included with petitioner's complaint, ECF #1 . The Office of the Clerk files the document under separate cover. (afc)
August 7, 2018 2 MOTION for Emergency Preliminary Injunctions and Mandamus and Temporary Restraining Order pending FBI Investigation - filed by Petitioner Dorothy Kulik. (Attachments: #1 "Verified Complaint", #2 Exhibit A) (afc)
August 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIONS AND MANDAMUS filed by Dorothy Kulik against the United States, State of Hawaii, and County of Kauai. Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed IFP, #2 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint, Request for Injunctions and Mandamus, #3 COMPLAINT-TABLE OF CONTENTS, #4 COMPLAINT and Request for Injunctions and Mandamus, #5 Certification of Petitioner, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Appendix of Exhibits; Table of Contents, #8 Exhibit A - Part 1 of 3, #9 Exhibit A - Part 2 of 3 (Includes an Appendix Table of Contents with Exhibits marked A-1 through A-8. Exhibit A-8 is Digital Media (CD). The CD is retained.), #10 Exhibit A - Part 3 of 3, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Exhibit G - Digital Media (CD) [CD retained], #17 Transmittal letter, #18 Mailing documentation. (afc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kulik v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: County of Kauai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dorothy Kulik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?