20, LLC et al v. Ferreira et al

Plaintiff: 20, LLC and Lance Yamada
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Mitch Roth, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Non-Profit Entities 1-10 and Paul Ferreira
Case Number: 1:2018cv00311
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Hawaii
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen L. Martin on behalf of Paul Ferreira, Mitch Roth on behalf of Paul Ferreira, Mitch Roth. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Laureen)
September 11, 2018 13 AMENDED EO: The hearing on #5 Defendants Paul Ferreira, in his Official Capacity as the Chief of Police of the County of Hawaii and Mitch Roth, in his Official Capacity as the Prosecuting Attorney of the County of Hawaii's Motion To Dismiss is CONTINUED from 10/26/18 to 12/21/18 at 9:30 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE) (otake1)
September 11, 2018 12 EO: The hearing on #5 Defendants Paul Ferreira, in his Official Capacity as the Chief of Police of the County of Hawaii and Mitch Roth, in his Official Capacity as the Prosecuting Attorney of the County of Hawaii's Motion To Dismiss is CONTINUED from 11/30/18 to 12/21/18 at 9:30 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(otake1)
September 5, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00311-JAO-KSC on all further pleadings . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 09/05/2018. (apg, dist)
August 31, 2018 10 EO: Pursuant to Brian De Lima's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 11/2/2018 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/26/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
August 30, 2018 9 EO: #5 Defendants Paul Ferreira, in his Official Capacity as the Chief of Police of the County of Hawaii and Mitch Roth, in his Official Capacity as the Prosecuting Attorney of the County of Hawaii's Motion To Dismiss originally set for 11/30/2018 is ADVANCED to 10/26/2018 at 09:30 am before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. The briefing schedule for this motion is governed by the Local Rules, based on the new hearing date of 10/26/2018. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
August 16, 2018 8 EO: Brian De Lima and Mr. Yamada may appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/18 @ 9:00 a.m. Mr. Delima to provide the CRM (Toni Fujinaga at 541-1297) his telephone number. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
August 14, 2018 7 NOTICE of Hearing on #5 Defendants Paul Ferreira, in his Official Capacity as the Chief of Police of the County of Hawaii and Mitch Roth, in his Official Capacity as the Prosecuting Attorney of the County of Hawaii's Motion To Dismiss set for 11/30/2018 at 10:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (tyk)
August 13, 2018 6 EO: John Mukai may appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/18 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
August 13, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss John S. Mukai appearing for Defendants Paul Ferreira, Mitch Roth (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of John S. Mukai, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Certificate of Service)(Mukai, John)
August 13, 2018 4 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
August 13, 2018 3 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/17/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/13/2018. (afc)
August 13, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00311-DKW-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)
August 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mitch Roth, in his official capacity as the Prosecuting Attorney of the County of Hawaii, Paul Ferreira, in his official capacity as the Chief of Police of the County of Hawaii from Third Circuit Court, case number 18-1-0160. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2074112), filed by Mitch Roth, in his official capacity as the Prosecuting Attorney of the County of Hawaii, Paul Ferreira, in his official capacity as the Chief of Police of the County of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John S. Mukai, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mukai, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 20, LLC et al v. Ferreira et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Roth
Represented By: John S. Mukai
Represented By: Andrew D.I. Son
Represented By: Laureen L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Non-Profit Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ferreira
Represented By: John S. Mukai
Represented By: Andrew D.I. Son
Represented By: Laureen L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 20, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. De Lima
Represented By: Jeremy J. K. Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Yamada
Represented By: Brian J. De Lima
Represented By: Jeremy J. K. Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?