Nozaki v. Tram's LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Aja Nozaki
Defendant: Tram's LLC and Tram Ngoc Ngo
Case Number: 1:2018cv00314
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
2 Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 EO: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer and Request to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference filed on October 11, 2018, the Court grants the request. Defendants shall have until November 12, 2018 to file an Answer and the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference shall be continued to 12/20/18 @ 9:00 AM.granting #18 Motion to Continue. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/20/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Aja Nozaki re 16 Set Hearings, Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer and Request to Continue Rule 16 Status Conference Aja Nozaki. (Kukona Pakele, Lindsay) Docket entry modified on 10/11/2018: Filing event modified from Notice to a Motion to Continue (afc).
October 4, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aja Nozaki re 16 Set Hearings, (Kukona Pakele, Lindsay)
September 25, 2018 Filing 16 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 11/5/2018 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by October 29, 2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aja Nozaki. Tram's LLC served on 9/20/2018. (Kukona Pakele, Lindsay) Modified on 9/24/2018 (emt, ).
September 21, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aja Nozaki. Tram Ngoc Ngo served on 9/20/2018 . (Kukona Pakele, Lindsay) Modified on 9/24/2018 (emt, ).
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Tram Ngoc Ngo, Tram's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons as to Tram's LLC)(cib, )
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis re #3 . Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 9/14/2018. (cib, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 Declaration re 10 Link,, to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (Kukona Pakele, Lindsay)
September 9, 2018 Filing 10 EO: Currently pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. In the Application, Plaintiff indicates that she has a partner. However, it is unclear whether her partner resides in the same household and/or contributes income to the household. Plaintiff is directed to file a declaration clarifying this issue by 9/14/18. If Plaintiff's partner resides in the same household, she should provide her partner's gross income and the frequency with which it is received, along with any other income that might be relevant to the IFP determination. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(otake1)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00314-JAO-KSC on all further pleadings . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 09/05/2018. (apg, dist)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Kukona Pakele, Lindsay)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Kukona Pakele, Lindsay)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/15/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, ) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00314-LEK-KSC on all further pleadings. (cib, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 Errata re #1 Complaint Exhibit 1 Consent to Join and Participate as Party Plaintiff. (Kukona Pakele, Lindsay)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (Kukona Pakele, Lindsay) Modified event type to motion on 9/4/2018 (cib, ).
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Aja Nozaki. (Kukona Pakele, Lindsay)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Aja Nozaki.(Kukona Pakele, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nozaki v. Tram's LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aja Nozaki
Represented By: Daniel J. O'Meara
Represented By: Lindsay C. Kukona Pakele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tram's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tram Ngoc Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?