Scanlan v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Mikaele G. Scanlan
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00315
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
0 Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
1 Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
2 Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edric Ming-Kai Ching on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Ching, Edric)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00315-JAO-KJM on all further pleadings . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 09/05/2018. (apg, dist)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(cib, )
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Application To Proceed In District Court Without Repaying Fees or Costs re #3 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/21/2018. (cib, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Department of Justice. (emt, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00315 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Diane C. Haar appearing for Plaintiff Mikaele G Scanlan (Haar, Diane)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Haar, Diane)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Mikaele G. Scanlan against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Mikaele G Scanlan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haar, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scanlan v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikaele G. Scanlan
Represented By: Diane C. Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?