Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC v. Rails International, LLC

Plaintiff: Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC
Defendant: Rails International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00321
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2018 18 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report of the Parties' Conference Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Local Rule 26.1. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miwa, Colin)
October 5, 2018 17 Scheduling Conference Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2(b). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Miwa, Colin)
September 14, 2018 16 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF KONA BAY HAWAII, LLC'S COMPLAINT - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 9/14/2018. Rails International, LLC answer due 10/3/2018. (emt, )
September 13, 2018 15 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC and Rails International, LLC. Please continue to reflect case number CV 18-00321 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 12, 2018 ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the docket number #12 First Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC's Complaint filed by Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC, shall be submitted for consideration to Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield at mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (emt, )
September 12, 2018 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rails International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Doyle, Colleen)
September 12, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen P. Doyle on behalf of Rails International, LLC on behalf of Rails International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Doyle, Colleen)
September 11, 2018 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC's Complaint by Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC. (Miwa, Colin)
August 30, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC. Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miwa, Colin)
August 16, 2018 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC. (Miwa, Colin)
August 16, 2018 9 NOTICE and TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENT: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Patent or Trademark. Alternatively, a fillable AO 120 form is available at website address http://www.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/ao120.pdf Once completed, please electronically file the form using filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 120 Report to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. Please contact the Clerk's Office should you have further questions (808) 541-1890. (afc)
August 16, 2018 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
August 16, 2018 7 Summons Issued as to Rails International, LLC. (afc)
August 16, 2018 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form to Consent) (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). *** The party filing the case is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice of Assignment and the attached Election Form.
August 16, 2018 5 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
August 16, 2018 4 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/15/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/16/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 16, 2018 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00321-KJM on all further pleadings. (afc)
August 16, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC, a Hawaii limited liability company. (Miwa, Colin)
August 16, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Rails International, LLC, a California limited liability company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2077144.), filed by Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC, a Hawaii limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Summons)(Miwa, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC v. Rails International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kona Bay Hawaii, LLC
Represented By: Martin E. Hsia
Represented By: Keri Ann K.S. Krzykowski
Represented By: Colin O. Miwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rails International, LLC
Represented By: Colleen P. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?