Richardson vs. Hilton Resorts Corporation

Plaintiff: Ruby Richardson
Defendant: Hilton Resorts Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00340
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
1 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilton Resorts Corporation [Re: Notice Of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination Of Deponent: Jose G. Henao] (Pepper, Andrew)
November 8, 2018 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilton Resorts Corporation [Re: Notice Of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination Of Deponent: Carl Maybin] (Pepper, Andrew)
November 6, 2018 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilton Resorts Corporation [Re: Defendant's First Request For Admissions To Plaintiff; Exhibit 1] (Pepper, Andrew)
November 5, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER Setting Settlement Conference. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 11/5/2018. (cib, )
November 5, 2018 16 Featured Case RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 11/5/2018. (cib, )
November 5, 2018 15 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 11/5/2018. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 11/12/2019 in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/1/2019 at 09:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference is set for 8/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference statements by 8/20/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/12/2019. Discovery due by 9/13/2019. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:00 a.m. - 9:10 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
November 2, 2018 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilton Resorts Corporation [Re: Defendant's First Request For Production Of Documents And Things To Plaintiff] (Pepper, Andrew)
November 2, 2018 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilton Resorts Corporation [Re: Defendant's First Request For Answers To Interrogatories To Plaintiff] (Pepper, Andrew)
October 29, 2018 12 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Healy, Michael)
October 16, 2018 11 Scheduling Conference Statement by Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew)
October 16, 2018 10 REPORT of Planning Meeting [Joint Report]. (Pepper, Andrew)
October 16, 2018 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Dismiss Count VII. Motion Hearing date has been set for 12/10/2018 10:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (tl, )
October 10, 2018 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hilton Resorts Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Hilton Grand Vacations Borrower, LLC for Hilton Resorts Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew)
October 10, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss Count VII Andrew L. Pepper appearing for Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew)
October 5, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Hilton Resorts Corporation served on 10/3/2018 filed by Ruby Richardson. (cib, )
September 10, 2018 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 10, 2018 4 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/5/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 10, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Hilton Resorts Corporation. (emt, )
September 10, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00340 LEK-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Richardson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2087408.), filed by Ruby Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brower, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson vs. Hilton Resorts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Resorts Corporation
Represented By: Andrew L. Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Richardson
Represented By: Charles H. Brower
Represented By: Michael P. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?