Bumanglag v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jesse Bumanglag
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, John Does 1-10, Doe Entities 1-10 and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00342
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
1 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 13 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2018 is CONTINUED to 12/14/2018 at 09:30AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 12/07/2018. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
November 5, 2018 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jesse Bumanglag. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company waiver sent on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Lotenschtein, Edward)
November 4, 2018 11 REPORT of Planning Meeting Plaintiff's Report of Meeting of the Parties. (Lotenschtein, Edward)
November 4, 2018 10 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Lotenschtein, Edward)
November 4, 2018 9 Errata Waiver of Service of Summons. (Lotenschtein, Edward)
September 13, 2018 8 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/06/2018 is CONTINUED to 11/20/2018 at 09:00AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 11/13/2018. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
September 11, 2018 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib, )
September 11, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (cib, )
September 11, 2018 5 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/6/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, ) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
September 11, 2018 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00342-HG-RLP on all further pleadings. (cib, )
September 11, 2018 3 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons)(Lotenschtein, Edward)
September 11, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2087670.), filed by Jesse Bumanglag. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Demand for Jury Trial)(Lotenschtein, Edward) Modified on 9/11/2018 to add receipt number to docket text (cib, ).
September 11, 2018 1 Civil Cover Sheet filed as a Complaint. against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2087670.), filed by Jesse Bumanglag.(Lotenschtein, Edward) Modified on 9/11/2018 docket to reflect that civil cover sheet was filed in place of complaint. See document #2 for Original Complaint (cib, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bumanglag v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Bumanglag
Represented By: Edward Daniel Lotenschtein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?