Fujikane v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Tracie L. Fujikane
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00344
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
1 Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 7 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/14/2018 IS CONTINUED TO 11/21/2018 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 11/14/2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 27, 2018 6 EO: Ms. Wall informs the Court that the parties have agreed to mediation and are in the process of setting it up. A joint request that the Rule 16 Conference be continued for approximately 30 days is GRANTED. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 10/15/2018 IS CONTINUED TO 11/14/2018 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 19, 2018 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS; Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate - received from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii. Transmission of those documents filed in the State Court Civil case 18-1-1202-08-DEO. (Attachments: #1 First Circuit Court Computerized Index, #2 Circuit Court Of The First Circuit State of Hawaii Pleadings) (cib, )
September 12, 2018 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wall, Patricia)
September 11, 2018 3 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/15/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, ) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
September 11, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00344-SOM-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib, )
September 11, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 18-1-1202-08. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2088146), filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Wall, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fujikane v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie L. Fujikane
Represented By: Christopher T. Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Patricia K. Wall
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?