PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund v. Akua Air Conditioning LLC

Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund and PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund
Defendant: Akua Air Conditioning LLC, Calbert H. Baitlon, Doe Trusts 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00347
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
1 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 12 EO: Based on Plaintiffs' counsel's request, the deadline to file the appropriate motion for default judgment is CONTINUED from 12/11/2018 to 2/19/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)
October 30, 2018 11 EO: Based on the entry of default, ECF No. #10 , the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2018 is VACATED. No later than 12/11/2018, Plaintiffs shall file the appropriate motion for default judgment. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)
October 27, 2018 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Akua Air Conditioning LLC, and Calbert H. Baitlon re: #9 . (afc)
October 26, 2018 9 MOTION for Entry of Default Default Judgment as to Against Defendants Akua Air Conditioning LLC and Calbert H. Baitlon Christin D. W. Kawada appearing for Plaintiffs PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christin D. W. Kawada, #2 Entry of Default Against Defendants Akua Air Conditioning LLC and Calbert H. Baitlon)(Kawada, Christin) Docket entry modified on 10/27/2018 (afc).
October 16, 2018 8 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/09/2018 is CONTINUED to 12/11/2018 at 09:00AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 12/04/2018. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
October 9, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund. Calbert H. Baitlon. (Kawada, Christin)
October 9, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund. Akua Air Conditioning LLC. (Kawada, Christin)
September 14, 2018 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 14, 2018 4 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/9/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 14, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Akua Air Conditioning LLC. (emt, )
September 14, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00347 JMS-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT ; Summons against Akua Air Conditioning LLC, a Hawaii limited liability company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2089743.), filed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kawada, Christin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund v. Akua Air Conditioning LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akua Air Conditioning LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calbert H. Baitlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?