U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Oceanic Time Warner Cable LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Oceanic Time Warner Cable LLC, Charter Communications, Inc. and Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2018cv00357
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Charter Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2018, answer due 12/10/2018; Oceanic Time Warner Cable LLC waiver sent on 10/9/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Yau, Eric)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 EO: Counsel Eric Yau informs the Court that the Defendants waived service of summons 60 days and therefore request that the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference be continued. For good cause shown, the request is granted. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/19/2018 IS CONTINUED TO 01/14/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 01/07/2019. Counse Eric Yau to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 11/19/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charter Communications, Inc. (emt, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Oceanic Time Warner Cable LLC. (emt, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00357 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charter Communications, Inc., Oceanic Time Warner Cable LLC dba Spectrum, filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Oceanic Time Warner Cable LLC dba Spectrum, #3 Proposed Summons - Charter Communications, Inc.)(Park, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Oceanic Time Warner Cable LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Anna Y. Park
Represented By: Eric Yau
Represented By: Sue J. Noh
Represented By: Rumduol Vuong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oceanic Time Warner Cable LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?