Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds v. First Pacific Builders, LLC
Plaintiff: Vacation & Holiday Fund, Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Market Recovery Program, Drywall Training Fund, Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds, 401-K Fund, Financial Security Fund and Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-100, First Pacific Builders, LLC, Doe Governmental Units 1-100, John Does 1-100, Doe Entities 1-100, Jane Does 1-100 and Doe Partnerships 1-100
Case Number: 1:2018cv00370
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 EO: Pursuant to Jeffrey Miller's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 1/17/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/10/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to First Pacific Buuilders, LLC :. Motion Hearing is set for 12/14/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (tbf, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to First Pacific Buuilders, LLC Jeffrey P. Miller appearing for Plaintiff Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey P. Miller, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Declaration of Sarah Kobayashi, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to First Pacific Builders, LLC. (cib, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 EX PARTE Request to Clerk for Entry of Default of Defendant First Pacific Builders, LLC Jeffrey P. Miller appearing for Plaintiff Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey P. Miller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Entry of Default of Defendant, #4 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/6/2018 to term motion(cib, ).
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds. First Pacific Builders, LLC. (Miller, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/26/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to First Pacific Builders, LLC. (emt, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00370 SOM-KSC on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Miller, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; Exhibits "A" and "B" against First Pacific Builders, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2095569.), filed by Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds v. First Pacific Builders, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Pacific Builders, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vacation & Holiday Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apprenticeship & Training Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Market Recovery Program
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drywall Training Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 401-K Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Security Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?