Slezak v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Richard Slezak
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00371
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE: The Action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. re: Orders, ECF #4 , (5). (afc)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants will be served on October 17, 2018 by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF.
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 EO: On 10/2/18, this Court issued an Order Denying Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court imposed a deadline of 10/15/18 for Plaintiff to resubmit an Application addressing all deficiencies or pay the applicable filing fee. The Court cautioned Plaintiff that his failure to meet this deadline would result in the dismissal of this action. Plaintiff has failed to submit another IFP application or pay the filing fee. Accordingly, this action is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk's office is directed to close the case. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re #2 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 10/1/2018. If Plaintiff wishes to resubmit an Application addressing the identified deficiencies, he must do so by October 15, 2018. Plaintiff must provide all information requested in the Application and include all relevant details and monetary values with respect to his assets and income. If Plaintiff does not intend to seek IFP status, he must pay the applicable filing fee by October 15, 2018. Failure to file another IFP Application or submit the applicable filing fee by October 15, 2018 will result in the dismissal of this action. (emt, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Richard Slezak served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on October 2, 2018. A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Slezak.
September 28, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #3 Status Report Order, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Richard Slezak. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Court will assess case status on Thursday, December 27, 2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/28/2018. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Richard Slezak. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Richard Slezak. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slezak v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Slezak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?