Chey v. Hawaii Film Office et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Chey
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Donne Dawson, Hawaii Film Office and Benita Brazier
Case Number: 1:2018cv00379
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 12 EO: Pursuant to James Paige's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 1/3/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 12/27/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 22, 2018 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donne Dawson, Benita Brazier, Hawaii Film Office. Donne Dawson waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018; Benita Brazier waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018; Hawaii Film Office waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Paige, James)
October 4, 2018 10 NOTICE of Case Reassignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. U.S. Magistrate Judge Kevin S.C. Chang remains as the assigned referral judge. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00379-DKW-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants will be served on October 5, 2018 by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 4, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON for all further proceedings. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00379-DKW-KSC on all further pleadings. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/4/2018. (afc)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants will be served on October 5, 2018 by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 4, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed: HAWAII FILM OFFICE served on 10/4/2018. (afc)
October 4, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed: DONNE DAWSON served on 10/4/2018. (afc)
October 4, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed: BENITA BRAZIER served on 10/4/2018.
October 3, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Hawaii Film Office; Donne Dawson; Benita Brazier. (afc)
October 3, 2018 4 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
October 3, 2018 3 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/3/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/3/2018. (afc) STAFF NOTATION: The order is captioned with case number CV 18-00279-JMS-KSC. The correct case number is CV 18-00379-JMS-KSC.
October 3, 2018 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number HI924897 re #1 Complaint. (afc)
October 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Hawaii Film Office; Benita Brazier; Donne Dawson; DOES 1-10 - filed by Timothy Chey.COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) FRAUD AND DECEIT(2) BREACH OF IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING(3) VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS 42 U.S.C. 1983 [Free Speech]; 42 U.S.C. 1983 [Equal Protection] (4) INTERFERENCE WITH PROSPECTIVE BUSINESS ADVANTAGE (5) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT (6) INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION (7) NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION (8) PROMISSORY FRAUD (9) BREACH OF IMPLIED CONTRACT (10) QUANTUM MERUIT (11) NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS (12) INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS (13) CIVIL CONSPIRACY (14) UNFAIR COMPETITION (15) PROMISSORY ESTOPPEL (16) BREACH OF ACCOUNTING (17) DECLARATORY RELIEF(18) UNJUST ENRICHMENT (19) PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION (2) WRIT OF ATTACHMENT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy Chey, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (afc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chey v. Hawaii Film Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donne Dawson
Represented By: James C. Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Film Office
Represented By: James C. Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benita Brazier
Represented By: James C. Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Chey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?