Won v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ghary David Won
Defendant: Nelnet, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00381
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: ALAN C KAY
1 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2018 16 EO: Based on counsel's request and agreement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2018 is CONTINUED to 3/13/2019 at 09:30AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 3/06/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
November 15, 2018 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nelnet, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate Nelnet Servicing, LLC for Nelnet, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Irons, Timothy)
November 15, 2018 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment: A Motion Hearing is set for Tuesday, February 5, 2019 at 11:00 AM before JUDGE ALAN C. KAY. (rls, )
November 14, 2018 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment Timothy H Irons appearing for Defendant Nelnet, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Concerning Authenticity of Business Records, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Declaration of Timothy H. Irons, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Certificate of Service)(Irons, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 12 Featured Case FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF GHARY DAVID WON'S COMPLAINT, FILED OCTOBER 4, 2018; ORDER. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 12/14/2018. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 11/5/2018. (afc)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 2, 2018 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wright, Douglas)
November 2, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah K. Wright on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wright, Deborah)
November 2, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas R. Wright on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wright, Douglas)
October 30, 2018 8 EO: The Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 11/29/2018 to 12/20/2018 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)
October 29, 2018 7 Featured Case STIPULATION FOR FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FILED ON OCTOBER 4, 2018. Defendant NELNET, INC. shall have up to and including November 14, 2018 to respond to the Complaint. APPROVED AND SO ORDERED by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 10/29/2018. (afc)Timothy H. Irons, Esq. and Timothy C. Partelow, Esq. (Law firm DENTONS US LLP) added as attorneys for defendant Nelnet, Inc.
October 4, 2018 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
October 4, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Nelnet, Inc.. (afc)
October 4, 2018 4 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
October 4, 2018 3 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/29/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/4/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
October 4, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE ALAN C. KAY and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Please reflect Civil case number CIVIL 18-00381-ACK-RLP on all further pleadings. (afc)
October 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2099448.), filed by Ghary David Won. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit (Proposed Summons))(Guzzo, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Won v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy H Irons
Represented By: Timothy C. Partelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah K. Wright
Represented By: Douglas R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghary David Won
Represented By: Andrew J. Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?