Dorman v. City of Honolulu et al

Plaintiff: Charles W. Dorman
Defendant: State of Hawaii, Department of Human Services and City of Honolulu
Case Number: 1:2018cv00385
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 5 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 12/28/2018 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 12/21/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 16, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER (1) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES OR COSTS; AND (2) DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re #1 , #2 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 10/16/2018. Dorman may have until to November 16, 2018 to file an amended complaint. The Court cautions Dorman that failure to file an amended complaint by November 16, 2018 may result in the automatic dismissal of this action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Dorman a blank Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO 240) so that he may comply with the directions in this Order. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Charles Dorman served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on October 16, 2018. A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs form shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Dorman.
October 9, 2018 3 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/10/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )
October 9, 2018 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Charles W. Dorman. (emt, )
October 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Charles W. Dorman. (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorman v. City of Honolulu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii, Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?