Pennymac Loan Services, LLC v. Ortega et al

Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Defendant: Lucas R. Ortega, Ramonalee Lehua Ortega, Doe Governmental Units 1-20, Doe Entities 1-20, Association of Unit Owners of Green Homes at Lualualei, John Does 1-20, Jane Does 1-20 and Doe Corporations 1-20
Case Number: 1:2018cv00386
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2018 14 EO: Pursuant to Lucas and Ramonalee Ortega's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 12/28/2018 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 12/21/18. The Ortega's to notify all counsel. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 13, 2018 13 OPPOSITION To Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Counterclaims and Motion To Remand To State Court re #7 filed by Lucas R. Ortega, Ramonalee Lehua Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(cib, )
November 12, 2018 12 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Berger, Thomas)
November 5, 2018 11 On October 31, 2018, Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Pennymac Loan Services, LLC filed:PLAINTIFF/COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC's MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS LUCAS R. ORTEGA AND RAMONALEE LEHUA ORTEGAS COUNTERCLAIM FILED HEREIN ON OCTOBER 9, 2018, AND TO REMAND CASE TO CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII. (ECF No. #7 ).Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition on or before Wednesday, November 21, 2018.Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Pennymac Loan Services, LLC shall file its Reply on or before Thursday, December 13, 2018.A hearing on Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Pennymac Loan Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Remand (ECF No. #7 ) shall be held on Thursday, January 3, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 1, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Bird on behalf of Pennymac Loan Services, LLC, Pennymac Loan Services, LLC on behalf of Pennymac Loan Services, LLC, Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bird, Michael)
November 1, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Summer H. Kaiawe on behalf of Pennymac Loan Services, LLC on behalf of Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kaiawe, Summer)
October 31, 2018 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company, LLC for Pennymac Loan Services, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berger, Thomas)
October 31, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiffs Lucas R. Ortega and Ramonalee Lehua Ortega's COUNTERCLAIM filed on October 9, 2018 and to Remand Case to Circuit Court of the First Circuit State of Hawaii , MOTION to Remand to State Court Thomas Johannes Berger appearing for Counter Defendant Pennymac Loan Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit Ex. A Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit Ex. B State Foreclosure Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex. C Recorded Mortgage, #6 Exhibit Ex. D Assignment of Mortgage, #7 Exhibit Ex. E Notice of Right to Cancel, #8 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Berger, Thomas)Docket text entry modified on 11/02/2018 to further describe title of document (afc).
October 12, 2018 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, CV 18-1-0730-05 JHC. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Exhibit "A"; Affirmation and Original Note Declaration; Summons, #5 Notice of Pendency of Action; Exhibit "A", #6 Ex Parte Motion for Order Identifying Doe Entities and Amending Case Caption; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibit "1"; (Proposed) Order, #7 Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Order Identifying Doe Entities and Amending Case Caption, #8 Ex Parte Motion for Order Correcting Name of Defendant; Exhibit 1; Order, #9 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (re Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation), #10 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (re Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation), #11 Declaration re Attempted Service of Complaint, #12 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (re Green Homes at Lualualei, LLC), #13 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (re Lucas R. Ortega), #14 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (re Ramonalee Lehua Ortega), #15 Declaration Re Attempted Service of Complaint, #16 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (emt, )
October 9, 2018 5 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/19/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )
October 9, 2018 4 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI024955 re #1 Notice of Removal. (emt, )
October 9, 2018 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Lucas R. Ortega, Ramonalee Lehua Ortega. (emt, )
October 9, 2018 2 RESPONSE AND COUNTERCLAIMS for: Declaratory Relief, Injunctive Relief, Violations of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act, Quiet Title - by Lucas R. Ortega, Ramonalee Lehua Ortega. [ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against Pennymac Loan Services, LLC] (emt, )
October 9, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lucas R. Ortega, Ramonalee Lehua Ortega from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 18-1-0730-05 JHC. Note: The Clerk's Office has filed and will re-enter the Response and Counterclaim, attached to the Notice of Removal, as separate docket entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Copy of State Foreclosure Complaint, #2 Response and Counterclaim) (emt, ) Modified on 10/10/2018: ECF No. #4 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI024955 re 1 Notice of Removal. (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC v. Ortega et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas R. Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramonalee Lehua Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Unit Owners of Green Homes at Lualualei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Anya M. Perez
Represented By: Summer H. Kaiawe
Represented By: Michael C. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?