Hable et al v. Kai Ohana Charters, LLC.
Plaintiff: Lorraine Hable and Donald Hable
Defendant: Kai Ohana Charters, LLC. and M/V Boom Boom II 677802
Case Number: 1:2018cv00395
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 12/11/2018. Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties and their lead counsel are hereby ORDERED TO APPEAR before the undersigned on September 18, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. (emt, )
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 12/11/2018. (emt, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 12/11/2018. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Non-Jury Trial is set for 1/28/2020 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/17/2019 at 09:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference is set for 9/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference statements by 9/11/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/28/2019. Discovery due by 11/29/2019. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:00 a.m. - 9:10 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kai Ohana Charters, LLC. (Initial Disclosures) (Nakano, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kai Ohana Charters, LLC. (Initial Disclosures) (Nakano, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Donald Hable, Lorraine Hable. (Lesser, Richard)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 Scheduling Conference Statement by Kai Ohana Charters, Inc.. (Nakano, Michael)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement by Plaintiffs Donald Hable and Lorraine Hable. (Lesser, Richard)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Planning Meeting by Plaintiffs Donald Hable and Lorraine Hable. (Lesser, Richard)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kai Ohana Charters, LLC.. (Nakano, Michael)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kai Ohana Charters, LLC..(Nakano, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Heidt, Janice)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/11/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 16, 2018 NOTICE TO NON E-FILER: The Clerk's Office will no longer serve the attorneys at Turbin Chu Heidt, a Law Corporation via both paper and electronic service. Beginning with the email service of document number 2 Notice of Case Assignment, the Clerk's Office will only serve Turbin Chu Heidt, a Law Corporation electronically to the email addresses of record in this case. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received this document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record on October 16, 2018. (emt, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00395 HG-RLP on all further pleadings. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received this document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record on October 16, 2018. (emt, ) Modified on 10/16/2018 (emt, ).
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kai Ohana Charters LLC, dba Boom Boom Sportfishing, and M/V Boom Boom II 677802 All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2104178.), filed by Plaintiffs Donald Hable and Lorraine Hable Richard Turbin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Heidt, Janice) Modified on 10/16/2018 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hable et al v. Kai Ohana Charters, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Hable
Represented By: Richard A. Lesser
Represented By: Janice D. Heidt
Represented By: Rai Saint Chu
Represented By: Richard Turbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hable
Represented By: Richard A. Lesser
Represented By: Janice D. Heidt
Represented By: Rai Saint Chu
Represented By: Richard Turbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kai Ohana Charters, LLC.
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Boom Boom II 677802
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?