Pico v. Empire Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sierra Savannah Kamala Pico and Sierra Savannah Kamalani Kamaka Pico
Defendant: Empire Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00398
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: ALAN C KAY
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Darin Robinson Leong on behalf of Empire Airlines, Inc. on behalf of Empire Airlines, Inc.. (Leong, Darin)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Empire Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (afc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT EMPIRE AIRLINES' SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (O'Heron, Kristi)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT re #8 Report of Planning Meeting by Empire Airlines, Inc. DEFENDANT EMPIRE AIRLINES' RULE 26(f) SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING. (O'Heron, Kristi)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Yolken, Kevin)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Yolken, Kevin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A Yolken on behalf of Sierra Savannah Kamalani Kamaka Pico on behalf of Sierra Savannah Kamalani Kamaka Pico. (Yolken, Kevin)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/17/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Empire Airlines, Inc. (emt, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00398 ACK-KSC on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Seitz, Eric)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2105483.), filed by Sierra Savannah Kamala Pico. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seitz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pico v. Empire Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Savannah Kamala Pico
Represented By: Gina May Szeto-Wong
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Della A. Belatti
Represented By: Jonathan M.F. Loo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Savannah Kamalani Kamaka Pico
Represented By: Gina May Szeto-Wong
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Della A. Belatti
Represented By: Jonathan M.F. Loo
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Darin Robinson Leong
Represented By: Kristi K. O'Heron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?