Padilla et al v. Crane Co.
Plaintiff: Wilhelmina Padilla, Domingo S Padilla and Wilhelmina Canyon Padilla
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Does 1 to 25, Crane Co. and Ingersoll Rand Co.
Undetermined: Keith Hunter
Estate Plaintiff: Domingo S. Padilla
Case Number: 1:2018cv00402
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. re #22 Amended Complaint, Defendant Cleaver Brooks, Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed December 5, 2018 Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claims Against All Other Defendants, #2 Answer to Cross-Claims, #3 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Lissa)
December 5, 2018 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Ingersoll Rand Co. (emt, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Crane Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Flowserve US Inc., Does 1 to 25 , Ingersoll Rand Co., filed by Wilhelmina Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(DeRobertis, L.) Modified on 12/5/2018 (emt, ).
December 5, 2018 Filing 21 EO: Based on the lack of opposition and finding good cause in support thereof, the Court GRANTS #19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall filed their First Amended Complaint no later than 12/12/2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)
November 16, 2018 Filing 20 EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d), the Court elects to decide #19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint without a hearing. Briefing shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.4. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI) (agh)
November 16, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint L. Richard DeRobertis appearing for Plaintiffs Domingo S. Padilla, Wilhelmina Padilla (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(DeRobertis, L.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reinke, Stefan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefan M. Reinke on behalf of Flowserve US Inc. on behalf of Flowserve US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reinke, Stefan)
November 9, 2018 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Crane Co.'s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tam-Sugiyama, Joyce)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement Cleaver Brooks Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Lissa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver-Brooks, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Lissa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Joinder Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal Lissa H. Andrews appearing for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Certificate of Service)(Andrews, Lissa)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR KEITH HUNTER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 11/2/2018. (afc)Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for November 19, 2018, is VACATED. (Status Conference is set for 1/31/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI.) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEA copy of the instant order will be served this date by First Class Mail addressed to:KEITH W. HUNTER1003 BISHOP STREET SUITE 1155HONOLULU HI 96813
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 [REPORT of Planning Meeting] Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi from L. Richard DeRobertis, Esq., dated October 30, 2018 Re: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for November 19, 2018. . (DeRobertis, L.) Modified on 11/20/2018 (emt, ).
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Complaint Filed September 25, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM Defendant Crane Co.'s Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants against Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Does 1 to 25, Flowserve US Inc. by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants, #2 Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William) Modified on 11/20/2018 (emt, ).
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii; CV 18-1-1509-09-JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Regarding Hawaii Judicial Information System (HAJIS), #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet) (cib, ) entire first circuit record attached as attachments to the notice of removal with additional exhibits filed by Crane Co.
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 REDACTION to #1 Notice of Removal, Redacted Exhibit "A" to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1] by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint; Exhibit A; Summons)(Harstad, William)
October 22, 2018 ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that Exhibit A to the #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Co., contains personal identifiers. The filing party may refer to LR100.10.1. Personal Identifiers, LR100.10.2. Redaction/Reference List and LR100.10.3. Responsibility of Counsel. The filing party may submit a redacted version of Exhibit A. For e-filing purposes, please include a caption cover page that references that case number, and includes counsel identification and a document caption. The filer may select the filing event "Redacted Document" from the "Other Documents" category. When prompted by the filing system, please "link" the redacted exhibit to the Notice of Removal, ECF No. #1 . (emt, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/19/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/19/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-000402-DKW-RLP on all further pleadings. (afc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Co. by Crane Co. Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D2 - Forman pp 201-325, #2 Exhibit D3 - Forman pp 326-421, #3 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Co. by Crane Co. Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C4 - Sargent pp 651-818, #2 Exhibit D - Forman pp 1-100, #3 Exhibit D1 - Forman pp 101-200)(Harstad, William)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Co. by Crane Co. Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C2 - Sargent pp 326-450, #2 Exhibit C3 - Sargent pp 451-650)(Harstad, William)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2106650), filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Harstad, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint; Exhibit A; Summons (RESTRICTED to "Case Participants") , #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of A. Pantaleoni, #4 Exhibit C - Sargent pp 1-200, #5 Exhibit C1- Sargent pp 201-325)(Harstad, William) Modified on 10/23/2018 to restrict Exhibit A to "Case Participants". The filer has submitted a redacted version of Exhibit A, refer to ECF No. #8 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla et al v. Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Stefan M. Reinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Lissa H. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Derek B Simon
Represented By: Joyce W. Y. Tam-Sugiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilhelmina Padilla
Represented By: Allison M. Fujita
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domingo S Padilla
Represented By: Allison M. Fujita
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilhelmina Canyon Padilla
Represented By: Allison M. Fujita
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Keith Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Domingo S. Padilla
Represented By: Allison M. Fujita
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?