Trade West, Inc. v. Forum Novelties, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trade West, Inc.
Defendant: Forum Novelties, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00411
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FIRST STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT FORUM NOVELTIES, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FILED ON OCTOBER 26, 2018 [DKT. #1 ]; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/10/2018. Forum Novelties, Inc. answer due 2/15/2019. Kevin Scholosser, Esq., on behalf of Defendant Forum Novelties, Inc., served by First Class Mail at Meyer, Suozzi, English and Klein, P.C., 990 Stewart Avenue, Suite 300, Garden City, NY 11530 on December 10, 2018. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received this document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
December 10, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 13 Entering Order continuing the December 24, 2018 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to 9:30 AM on March 5, 2019, has been served by First Class Mail to Robert Kamin, Managing Director, Forum Novelties, Inc., 1771 Walt Whitman Road, Melville, NY 11747. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (mansfield1)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 EO: The Court GRANTS the parties' request in #12 Plaintiff's Report of the Rule 26(f) Meeting of Parties and Request to Postpone Scheduling Conference to continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. The Court CONTINUES the December 24, 2018 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference TO 9:30 AM on March 5, 2019, in COURTROOM 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield1)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting - PLAINTIFFS REPORT OF THE RULE 26 (f) MEETING OF THE PARTIES AND REQUEST TO POSTPONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Yasunaga, Milton) Modified on 12/4/2018 (emt, ).
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #8 Summons Issued [Forum Novelties, Inc. served on 11/26/2018] Acknowledgement filed by Trade West, Inc.. (Yasunaga, Milton) Modified on 12/4/2018 (emt, ).
November 26, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #9 Errata, #1 Complaint, #10 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark has been served by First Class Mail to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office at Mail Stop 8, Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P. O. Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 on November 26, 2018. (emt, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Trade West, Inc. re #6 Notice (Other),, [Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark] Trade West, Inc.. (Yasunaga, Milton)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 Errata re #1 Complaint, Plaintiff Trade West, Inc.s Errata to Correct Exhibit 12 of the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12)(Yasunaga, Milton)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Forum Novelties, Inc. (afc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Yasunaga, Milton)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE and TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENT: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Patent or Trademark. Alternatively, a fillable AO 120 form is available at website address http://www.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/ao120.pdf Once completed, please electronically file the form using filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 120 Report to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. Please contact the Clerk's Office should you have further questions (808) 541-1890. (afc)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form to Consent) (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). *** The party filing the case is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice of Assignment and the attached Election Form.
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/24/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/26/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00411-KJM on all further pleadings. (afc)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forum Novelties, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2110867.), filed by Trade West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Jury Demand, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yasunaga, Milton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trade West, Inc. v. Forum Novelties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trade West, Inc.
Represented By: Milton M. Yasunaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forum Novelties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?