Makai Ranch LLC v. First American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Makai Ranch LLC and Makai Ranch, LLC
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company and Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00431
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 EO: The Settlement Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 10:00 AM is CONTINUED to 01:30 PM, the same day, in Courtroom 8 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements are due by 1/30/2019 and emailed to kurren_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 1/3/2019. (cib, )
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 1/3/2019. (cib, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 1/3/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Non-Jury Trial is set for 2/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/31/2019 at 09:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference is set for 2/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference statements by 1/30/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/11/2019. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:00 a.m. - 9:10 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement of First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kaiawe, Summer)
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement by Plaintiff Makai Ranch. (Seehase, Loren)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Seehase, Loren)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kaiawe, Summer)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kaiawe, Summer)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 Declaration of Service. (Kugle, Gregory)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to First American Title Insurance Company. (afc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/3/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/8/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00431-LEK-RLP on all further pleadings. (afc)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Makai Ranch LLC. (Kugle, Gregory)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Makai Ranch LLC. (Kugle, Gregory)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2115040.), filed by Makai Ranch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Kugle, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makai Ranch LLC v. First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makai Ranch LLC
Represented By: Gregory W. Kugle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makai Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Gregory W. Kugle
Represented By: Loren A. Seehase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Summer H. Kaiawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?