Alaka`i Mechanical Corporation v. SUMO-NAN JV II LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alaka`i Mechanical Corporation
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and SUMO-NAN JV II LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00432
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: ALAN C KAY
2 Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00432 ACK-RT on all future pleadings . (emt, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 EO: Pursuant to Daniel Kim's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/19 @ 9:00AM is continued to 2/7/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/31/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, SUMO-NAN JV II LLC. (afc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/7/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/8/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE ALAN C. KAY and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00432-ACK-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaka`i Mechanical Corporation. (Kim, Daniel)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Alaka`i Mechanical Corporation. (Kim, Daniel)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2115365.), filed by Alaka`i Mechanical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Summons)(Kim, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaka`i Mechanical Corporation v. SUMO-NAN JV II LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMO-NAN JV II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaka`i Mechanical Corporation
Represented By: Kale Feldman
Represented By: Daniel T. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?