Dano v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Dana Ann Dano
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00434
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Asim H. Modi on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Modi, Asim)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00434 DKW-RT on all future pleadings . (emt, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to Danielle Rose Beaver, Esq., counsel for Plaintiff Dana Ann Dano re ECF No. 5 Minute Order, granting ex parte application to proceed in forma pauperis, dated January 3, 2019. (emt, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (jo)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 EO: On December 14, 2018, Plaintiff Dana Ann Dano filed an ex parte application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs, Dkt. No. 6. Having reviewed the application, and based upon Plaintiff's representations therein, the application (Dkt. No. 6) is GRANTED because Plaintiff has no assets to use as security and, after taking into consideration Plaintiff's alleged monthly expenses, she has insufficient income to pay the filing fee. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 EX PARTE Application Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Costs or Fees Danielle Rose Beaver appearing for Plaintiff Dana Ann Dano (Beaver, Danielle) Modified on 12/18/2018 to correct filing event to the following: Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (emt, ).
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 1/22/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/15/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 1/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00434-DKW-KSC on all further pleadings. (cib, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Beaver, Danielle)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Dana Ann Dano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beaver, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dano v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Asim H. Modi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Ann Dano
Represented By: Danielle Rose Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?