Emrit v. Spring Mountain Treatment Center (SMTC)
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Spring Mountain Treatment Center (SMTC)
Case Number: 1:2018cv00437
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00437-DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (apg, dist)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115 re #7 Order to Show Cause and Order Granting Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs (jo)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Ronald Satish Emrit at 655 38th Lane East Sarasota, FL 34243 re #1 - Complaint, #2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 - Application to Proceed IFP, #4 - Order Setting Rule 16 Conference, #5 - Civil Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 return to sender envelope) (cib, )
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND COSTS - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/20/2018. Emrit may have until December 7, 2018 to respond to this Order to Show Cause. The Court forewarns Emrit that failure to file a response by December 7, 2018 will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2018. Motion terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald Satish Emrit.
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 1/22/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/15/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Intake Staff mailed a copy of the Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and copies of the Complaint and IFP application to Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit at the following address: 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243 on November 14, 2018 (address referenced on mailing envelope). Additionally, copies were mailed to Mr. Emrit at the following address (identified by Plaintiff as his "current" mailing address): 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720 on November 15, 2018.
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit. (emt, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Ronald Satish Emrit. (emt, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Spring Mountain Treatment Center (SMTC) - filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. Note: On page 2 of the Complaint, the Plaintiff identifies his current mailing address as: 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720. The address reflected on the mailing envelope is 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Spring Mountain Treatment Center (SMTC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Mountain Treatment Center (SMTC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?