United States for the use and benefit of Vellutini Corporation etc. v. David Boland, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States for the use and benefit of Vellutini Corporation, doing business as Royal Electric Company, a California corporation and Vellutini Corporation
Defendant: David Boland, Inc. and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00441
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ROBERT D. SOWELL re #14 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 1/11/2019. (emt, )
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DENIS L. DURKIN re #12 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 1/11/2019. (emt, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing on #9 Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and #10 Defendants' Motion To Stay Or, Alternatively, To Compel Arbitration is set for 3/1/2019 at 09:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (tyk)
January 9, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Vitale; Declaration of Counsel Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2140095. Anna H. Oshiro appearing for Defendants David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company (Oshiro, Anna)
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Robert D. Sowell; Declaration of Counsel Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2140096.Anna H. Oshiro appearing for Defendants David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company (Oshiro, Anna)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Vitale; Declaration of Counsel Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2140095.Anna H. Oshiro appearing for Defendants David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company (Oshiro, Anna)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Denis L. Durkin; Declaration of Counsel Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2140094.Anna H. Oshiro appearing for Defendants David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company (Oshiro, Anna)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna H. Oshiro on behalf of David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company on behalf of David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company. (Oshiro, Anna)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay or, Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Loren A. Seehase appearing for Defendants David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay or, Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Craig Hildebrandt, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Certificate of Word Count, #8 Certificate of Service)(Seehase, Loren) Modified on 1/8/2019 (emt, ). Modified on 1/9/2019 This document is signed "/s/ Anna H. Oshiro" but is e-filed by Loren A. Seehase (emt, ).
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Loren A. Seehase appearing for Defendants David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Word Count, #3 Certificate of Service)(Seehase, Loren) Modified on 1/9/2019 Note: This document is signed "/s/ Anna H. Oshiro", but is e-filed by Loren A. Seehase. (emt, ).
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vellutini Corporation. (Gall, Charles)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Summons in a Civil Action - ISSUED. (Attachments: Summons issued as to David Boland, Inc. AND: #1 Summons issued as to Western Surety Company) (afc)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/14/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00441-DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (afc)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Gall, Charles)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Gall, Charles)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2117168.), filed by United States for the use and benefit of Vellutini Corporation, doing business as Royal Electric Company, a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gall, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States for the use and benefit of Vellutini Corporation etc. v. David Boland, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Boland, Inc.
Represented By: Denis L. Durkin
Represented By: Robert D. Sowell
Represented By: Anna H. Oshiro
Represented By: Loren A. Seehase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Denis L. Durkin
Represented By: Robert D. Sowell
Represented By: Anna H. Oshiro
Represented By: Loren A. Seehase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States for the use and benefit of Vellutini Corporation, doing business as Royal Electric Company, a California corporation
Represented By: Charles W. Gall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vellutini Corporation
Represented By: Charles W. Gall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?