Emrit v. Apple Grove Foster Care Agency
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Apple Grove Foster Care Agency
Case Number: 1:2018cv00442
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG no longer assigned to case Please reflect new case number CV 18-00442-DKW-RT on all further pleadings . (apg, dist)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit at 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115 returned undeliverable re #7 Order to Show Cause and Order Granting Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs (jo)
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Re: #2 , #3 , #4 , and #5 ) Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit 4529 Townhall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115. (jo)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit at 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243 returned undeliverable. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Order Setting Rule 16 and Corporate Disclosure Memo, #4 IFP Application, #5 Civil Waiver of Service Packet) (emt, )
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES OR COSTS - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/20/2018. Emrit may have until December 7, 2018 to respond to this Order to Show Cause. The Court forewarns Emrit that failure to file a response by December 7, 2018 will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2018. Motion terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Ronald Satish Emrit shall be served by First Class Mail to the following addresses: 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243, 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720 and 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115 on November 21, 2018.
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 1/23/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/16/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Intake Staff mailed a copy of the Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and copies of the Complaint and IFP application toPlaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit at the following address: 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243 on November 15, 2018 (addressreferenced on mailing envelope). Additionally, copies were mailed to Mr. Emrit at the following addresses: 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720 (referenced on page 8 of Complaint) and 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115 (identified asPlaintiff's "current" mailing address on page 2 of the Complaint) on November 15, 2018. Modified on 11/15/2018 (emt, ).
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit. (emt, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Ronald Satish Emrit. (emt, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Grove Foster Care Agency - filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. Note: On page 2 of the Complaint, the Plaintiff identifies his current mailing address as: 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115 (this address is also referenced in CV 18-00436 HG-RLP). The following address: 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive,Bowie, MD 20720 is reflected on Page 6 of the Complaint (this address is identified by Plaintiff as his"current" mailing address in the following cases, CV 18-00437 DKW-KSC, CV 18-00438 HG-KSC).The address reflected on the mailing envelope is 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Apple Grove Foster Care Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Grove Foster Care Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?