Hawaii Masons' Pension Fund; et al. v. Ono Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Hawaii Masons and Plasterers Trust Funds, Hawaii Masons Health And Welfare Fund, Hawaii Masons Training Fund, Hawaii Masons' Pension Fund, Hawaii Masons' Vacation and Holiday Fund and Hawaii Masons' and Plasterers' Annuity Fund
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Ono Construction, LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00451
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 EO: In light of the entry of default against Defendant, the Court VACATES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2019. No later than 2/7/2019, Plaintiffs shall file the appropriate motion for default judgment. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against as to Ono Construction, LLC re ECF No. #8 . (emt, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Ono Construction LLC Jared N. Kawashima appearing for Plaintiffs Hawaii Masons Health And Welfare Fund, Hawaii Masons Training Fund, Hawaii Masons' Pension Fund, Hawaii Masons' Vacation and Holiday Fund, Hawaii Masons' and Plasterers' Annuity Fund (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jared N. Kawashima, #2 Entry of Default Against Ono Construction LLC)(Kawashima, Jared)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hawaii Masons' Pension Fund, Hawaii Masons Health And Welfare Fund, Hawaii Masons' and Plasterers' Annuity Fund, Hawaii Masons Training Fund, Hawaii Masons' Vacation and Holiday Fund. Ono Construction, LLC. (Kawashima, Jared)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ono Construction, LLC. (afc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/15/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/20/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00451-DKW-RLP on all further pleadings. (afc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; Summons against Ono Construction, LLC, a Hawaii limited liability company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2119819.), filed by Hawaii Masons' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kawashima, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawaii Masons' Pension Fund; et al. v. Ono Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ono Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Masons and Plasterers Trust Funds
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Masons Health And Welfare Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Masons Training Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Masons' Pension Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Masons' Vacation and Holiday Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Masons' and Plasterers' Annuity Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?