Beach Front Villas, LLC v. Rogers
Plaintiff: Beach Front Villas, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company and Beach Front Villas, LLC
Defendant: Jennifer Rogers
Case Number: 1:2018cv00457
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Jennifer Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Terrance M. Revere, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Certificate of Service)(Revere, Terrance)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 EO: #9 Motion to Remand is terminated. Motion is a duplicate of Doc {10] Motion to Remand. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 EO: In light of the pending motion to remand, the Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 to 2/28/2019 at 9:00AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 2/21/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION to Remand , #10 MOTION to Remand : Motion Hearing is set for 2/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand James P. Brumbaugh appearing for Plaintiff Beach Front Villas, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Brumbaugh, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand James P. Brumbaugh appearing for Plaintiff Beach Front Villas, LLC (Brumbaugh, James)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Akao, Alan)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 EO: Based on counsel's request and agreement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2018 is CONTINUED to 1/31/2019 at 09:00AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 1/24/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Jennifer Rogers Jennifer Rogers. (Revere, Terrance)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL re: Transmittal of Forms: (1) Please complete and return to the court the attached AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Patent or Trademark. Alternatively, a fillable AO 120 form is available at website address http://www.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/ao120.pdf (2) The Attorney Registry for the U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii does not reflect attorney Paul Howard Peters as a member of the Hawaii Federal Bar. Attached herein is a Petition for Admission with its instructions and information in regard to CM/ECF - Case Management/Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission; Instructions, (a fillable form is available at website www.hid.uscourts.gov; click on Forms and select the Miscellaneous category), #2 CM/ECF Memorandum) Please contact the Clerk's Office should you have further questions (808) 541-1890. SUE BEITIA, Clerk of Court by Anna F. Chang, Deputy Clerk. U.S. DISTRICT COURT DISTRICT OF HAWAII 300 Ala Moana Blvd. C-338Honolulu, Hawaii 96850-0338 (afc)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/21/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/21/2018. (afc)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00457-LEK-RLP on all further pleadings. (afc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jennifer Rogers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2120291), filed by Jennifer Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan K. Akao, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(Akao, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beach Front Villas, LLC v. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Rogers
Represented By: Alan K. Akao
Represented By: Terrance M. Revere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beach Front Villas, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beach Front Villas, LLC
Represented By: James P. Brumbaugh
Represented By: Paul H. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?