Wong v. Brower
Plaintiff: Abenel Makini Wong
Defendant: Patricia Marie Brower
Case Number: 1:2018cv00471
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Dismissal With Prejudice Abenel Makini Wong. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Leavitt, James)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Patricia Marie Brower. (afc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK OF COURT'S NOTICE re: #4 Order setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, and #5 Clerk's Memorandum regarding Corporate Disclosure Statements. *** Please be advised that Plaintiff is responsible for serving all parties with the Order setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference as well as the Memo re: Corporate Disclosure Statements*** (afc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/25/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/30/2018. (afc)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00471-JAO-RLP on all further pleadings. (afc)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABENEL MAKINI WONG. (Leavitt, James)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PATRICIA MARIE BROWER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2124019.), filed by ABENEL MAKINI WONG. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leavitt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wong v. Brower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abenel Makini Wong
Represented By: James T. Leavitt, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole P Kalakau
Represented By: Michael R. Cruise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Marie Brower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?