PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund v. ACME Mechanical LLC

Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund and PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, ACME Mechanical LLC, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00481
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: ROM TRADER
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order 16 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 2/4/2019. (emt, )
February 4, 2019 15 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference-Discussion held.Non-Jury Trial is set for February 10, 2020 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Watson.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order:Dates given:Non-Jury Trial is set for 2/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/31/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 11/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/11/2019. Discovery due by 12/13/2019.Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 2/4/2019. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(rls, )
January 25, 2019 14 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kawada, Christin)
January 25, 2019 13 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant ACME Mechanical LLC's Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service. (Harris, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2019 12 [AMENDED DOCUMENT] Defendant ACME Mechanical LLC's Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement; Certificate of Service by ACME Mechanical LLC. Amendment to #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Harris, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/25/2019 (emt, ).
January 24, 2019 11 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant ACME Mechanical LLC's Amended Answer to Complaint Filed on December 7, 2018; Certificate of Service by ACME Mechanical LLC.(Harris, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2019 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACME Mechanical LLC. (Harris, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2019 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant ACME Mechanical LLC's Answer to Complaint Filed on December 7, 2018; Certificate of Service by ACME Mechanical LLC.(Harris, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2019 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund. ACME Mechanical LLC. served on 1/3/2019. (Kawada, Christin) Modified on 1/10/2019 (emt, ).
January 4, 2019 7 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG no longer assigned to case Please reflect new case number CV 18-00481-DKW-RT on all further pleadings . (apg, dist)
December 7, 2018 ADVISORY ENTRY: The entry docket number #6 Notice Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge was filed incorrectly filed in this case as Magistrate Judge Kevin S.C. Chang has been assigned to this case. Please disregard the entry. No further action necessary. (jo)
December 7, 2018 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. Do not e-file the Election Form. After completing the form, parties can either email it to consent@hid.uscourts.gov, or mail it to U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd., Room C-338, Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov. (jo)
December 7, 2018 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 2/4/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo) Modified on 12/7/2018 to include instructions for attached documents (jo).
December 7, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
December 7, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 18-00481 DKW-KSC on all further pleadings. (jo)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT ;Summons against ACME Mechanical LLC, a Hawaii limited liability company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2127351.), filed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kawashima, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund v. ACME Mechanical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACME Mechanical LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?