Castle & Cooke Properties, Inc. v. United States of America, Department of the Army
Plaintiff: Castle & Cooke Properties, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Army
Case Number: 1:2018cv00488
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiff's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 4/16/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 4/9/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG no longer assigned to case . Please reflect new case number CV 18-00488-LEK-RT on all further pleadings . (apg, dist)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America, Department of the Army, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (afc)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/11/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/14/2018. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00488-LEK-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Castle & Cooke Properties, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Castle & Cooke, Inc. for Castle & Cooke Properties, Inc... (Omuro, Lennes)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, Department of the Army ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2130107.), filed by Castle & Cooke Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Omuro, Lennes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castle & Cooke Properties, Inc. v. United States of America, Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Castle & Cooke Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Lennes N. Omuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?