Hsiao v. Acosta
Plaintiff: Ya-Wen Hsiao
Defendant: Alexander Acosta
Case Number: 1:2018cv00502
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Yee on behalf of Alexander Acosta on behalf of Alexander Acosta. (Yee, Harry)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Go, Samuel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT re Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Alexander Acosta. (Go, Samuel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff Ya-Wen Hsiao's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Certificate of Service) (emt, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Go on behalf of Alexander Acosta on behalf of Alexander Acosta. (Go, Samuel)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ya-Wen Hsiao. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, in his capacity as the U.S. Secretary of Labor served as follows: (Attachments: #1 Service executed 1/3/2019 upon Office of the U.S. Attorney for the District of Hawaii, #2 Service executed 12/28/2018 upon U.S. Department of Labor, #3 Service executed 12/28/2018 upon the Attorney General of the United States) (afc)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 2/25/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jo) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served personally with the foregoing documents on the date of filing.
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Defendant Alexander Acosta. (jo)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION against Defendant Alexander Acosta filed by Plaintiff Ya-Wen Hsiao (Filing Fee $400-Receipt No. HI025487). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hsiao v. Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Harry Yee
Represented By: Samuel P. Go
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ya-Wen Hsiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?