Franke et al. v. Yates et al.
Plaintiff: Hans Franke and Louise Franke
Defendant: Julia A. Yates, CRC II, Inc., Does 1 through 50 and Dennis Yates
Case Number: 1:2019cv00007
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the docket number #11 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants Julia Yates and Dennis Yates to Respond to Complaint; (Proposed) Order filed by Dennis Yates, Julia A. Yates shall be submitted for consideration to Magistrate Judge Rom Trader at trader_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (emt, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS JULIA YATES and DENNIS YATES TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER by Dennis Yates, Julia A. Yates. (Thompson, Stephanie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 EO: The Court reschedules the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/19 @ 9:00 AM to 4/5/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 3/29/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
February 14, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #9 FIRST STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT CRC II, INC., FKA CLARK REALTY CORPORATION TO SERVE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; ORDER and Notice to Non E-Filer was served by First Class Mail to Douglas C. Smith, Esq. to the address of record on February 14, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
February 14, 2019 NOTICE TO NON E-FILER : The Clerk's Office will no longer serve the attorneys at Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert via both paper and electronic service. Beginning with the email service of document number #9 FIRST STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT CRC II, INC., FKA CLARK REALTY CORPORATION TO SERVE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; ORDER, the Clerk's Office will only serve Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert electronically to the email addresses of record in this case. (emt, )
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT CRC II, INC., FKA CLARK REALTY CORPORATION TO SERVE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 2/13/2019. CRC II, Inc. answer due 3/15/2019. (emt, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hans Franke, Louise Franke. (Fenton, Christian)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/19 @ 9:00 AM is CONTINUED TO 3/19/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 3/12/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Julia A. Yates, Dennis Yates, CRC II, Inc. (afc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 3/11/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/8/2019. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00007-DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (afc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2139647.), filed by Hans Franke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fenton, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franke et al. v. Yates et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Franke
Represented By: Christian Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Franke
Represented By: Christian Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia A. Yates
Represented By: Stephanie E.W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC II, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas C. Smith
Represented By: Ross R K Uehara-Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Yates
Represented By: Stephanie E.W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?