In Re: Lava Ocean Tours, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lava Ocean Tours, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: by Robert E. Tilton A.T., a minor, Teresa J. Tilton, Jessica Tilton, Robert E. Tilton and by Robert E. Tilton O.T., a minor
3Rd Party Defendant: Shane Turpin and Doe Defendants 1-20
In Re: In The Matter Of:
Case Number: 1:2019cv00023
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint, by Shane Turpin.(Lezy, Normand)
March 4, 2019 Filing 27 EO: COURT'S ORDER re 26 Correspondence. #18 MOTION to Dismiss Limitation Complaint, or, in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment re Liability and/or Limitation of Liability MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2019 at 09:45 AM is continued to 5/31/2019 at 09:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 25 EO: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Limitation Complaint, or, in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment re Liability and/or Limitation of Liability MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2019 at 09:45 AM is continued to 5/17/2019 at 09:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
February 25, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. Document Not Signed - Please be advised that document #24 Certificate of Service, filed by by Robert E. Tilton A.T., a minor, by Robert E. Tilton O.T., a minor, Teresa J. Tilton, Robert E. Tilton, Jessica Tilton missing the electronic signature. The filing party may refer to LR100.5.1., which states "The name of the CM/ECF user under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear (e.g. /s/ John or Jane Lawyer)". No further action necessary. (cib, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by by Robert E. Tilton A.T., a minor, by Robert E. Tilton O.T., a minor, Jessica Tilton, Robert E. Tilton, Teresa J. Tilton re #23 Declaration, (Supplemental) of Patrick F. McTernan re Exhibits N and O (McTernan, Patrick)
February 21, 2019 Filing 23 Supplemental Declaration of Patrick F. McTernan In Support of Motion TO Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Liability and/or Limitation of Liability; Exhibits "N" and "O" re #18 filed by Robert E. Tilton, Teresa J. Tilton and Jessica Tilton. (Attachments: #1 Disk- Exhibit N, #2 Disk - Exhibit O) RETAINED Disk Exhibit N and Exhibt O In Clerk's Office.(cib)
February 21, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #18 MOTION to Dismiss Limitation Complaint, or, in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment re Liability and/or Limitation of Liability : Motion Hearing is set for 4/26/2019 at 09:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #18 MOTION to Dismiss Limitation Complaint, or, in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment re Liability and/or Limitation of Liability : Motion Hearing is set for 4/26/2019 at 09:45 AM in Chambers of Judge Alan C. Kay before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 EO: terminating #19 Motion to Dismiss. Document is a separate and concise statement. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 Separate and Concise Statement of Facts in Support of Tilton Claimants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Liability and/or Limitation of Liability Patrick F. McTernan appearing for Third Party Plaintiffs Teresa J. Tilton, by Robert E. Tilton A.T., a minor, Robert E. Tilton, Jessica Tilton, by Robert E. Tilton O.T., a minor, Claimants Teresa J. Tilton, Robert E. Tilton, by Robert E. Tilton O.T., a minor, Jessica Tilton, Defendant by Robert E. Tilton A.T., a minor (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick F. McTernan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W, #23 Exhibit X, #24 Exhibit Y, #25 Declaration of Robert E. Tilton)(McTernan, Patrick)
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Limitation Complaint, or, in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment re Liability and/or Limitation of Liability Patrick F. McTernan appearing for Third Party Plaintiffs Teresa J. Tilton, by Robert E. Tilton A.T., a minor, Robert E. Tilton, Jessica Tilton, by Robert E. Tilton O.T., a minor, Claimants Teresa J. Tilton, Robert E. Tilton, by Robert E. Tilton O.T., a minor, Jessica Tilton, Defendant by Robert E. Tilton A.T., a minor (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Supplement Certificate of Compliance)(McTernan, Patrick). Added MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on 2/21/2019 (cib, ).
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 EO: In light of the Order Directing Issuance of Notice, Publication Thereof and Restraining Order, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019 is VACATED and a Status Conference is set for 9/4/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Issuance of Notice Publication Therefor and Restraining Order. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 2/14/2019. (cib)
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by by Robert E. Tilton A.T., a minor, by Robert E. Tilton O.T., a minor, Jessica Tilton, Robert E. Tilton, Teresa J. Tilton re #10 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint, (McTernan, Patrick)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Richard Fried, Jr on behalf of Robert E. Tilton on behalf of Robert E. Tilton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fried, L.)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise K. H. Kawatachi on behalf of Robert E. Tilton on behalf of Robert E. Tilton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kawatachi, Denise)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Shane Turpin re ECF No. #10 Third-Party Complaint. (emt, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 Summons (Proposed) (McTernan, Patrick)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 Tilton Claimants' Notice of Claim, and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Limitation of Liability (CORRECTED), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Tilton Plaintiffs against Shane Turpin, Doe Defendants 1-20 by by Robert E. Tilton A.T., a minor, Robert E. Tilton, by Robert E. Tilton O.T., a minor, Jessica Tilton, Teresa J. Tilton. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Third-Party Complaint Against Shane Turpin and Doe Defendants 1-20)(McTernan, Patrick)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Acknowledging Compliance With Rules F(1) and F(2) Of The Supplemental Rules For Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 2/6/2019. (cib)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Lava Ocean Tours, Inc. Posting Security for Costs Lava Ocean Tours, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Lava Ocean Tours, Inc. Filing Security Under Rule F of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions Lava Ocean Tours, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Security Under Rule F)(Lezy, Normand)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lava Ocean Tours, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Errata re #1 Complaint, for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lezy, Normand)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/14/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00023 LEK-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against All Parties ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2143933.), filed by Lava Ocean Tours, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark Knutson, #2 Exhibit A)(Lezy, Normand)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Lava Ocean Tours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lava Ocean Tours, Inc.
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Represented By: Jamie Christine S. Madriaga
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Represented By: Duane R. Miyashiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: by Robert E. Tilton A.T., a minor
Represented By: Denise K. H. Kawatachi
Represented By: L. Richard Fried, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick F. McTernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Teresa J. Tilton
Represented By: Denise K. H. Kawatachi
Represented By: L. Richard Fried, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick F. McTernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Jessica Tilton
Represented By: Denise K. H. Kawatachi
Represented By: L. Richard Fried, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick F. McTernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Robert E. Tilton
Represented By: Patrick F. McTernan
Represented By: Denise K. H. Kawatachi
Represented By: L. Richard Fried, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: by Robert E. Tilton O.T., a minor
Represented By: Denise K. H. Kawatachi
Represented By: L. Richard Fried, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick F. McTernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Shane Turpin
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In The Matter Of:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?