Kuntz et al v. Sea Sport Cruises Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Mr. David Kuntz, Mrs. Rita Kuntz, David Kuntz and Rita Kuntz
Defendant: Sea Sport Cruises Inc. dba Pacific Whale Foundation Eco Adventure Tours In Personam and M/V Ocean Journey In Rem, M/V Ocean Journey and Sea Sport Cruises Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00032
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 03/25/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 04/02/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 03/26/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sea Sport Cruises Inc.. (Lezy, Normand)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sea Sport Cruises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lezy, Normand)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Kuntz. All Defendants. (Heidt, Janice)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
January 23, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the Notice to Non E-Filer has been served by First Class Mail to Rai Saint Chu, Esq. at the address of record on January 23, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
January 23, 2019 NOTICE TO NON E-FILER :The Clerk's Office will no longer serve the attorneys at Turbin Chu Heidt, AAL via both paper and electronic service. Beginning with the email service of document number #6 Summons Issued, the Clerk's Office will only serve Turbin Chu Heidt, AAL electronically to the email addresses of record in this case. (emt, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sea Sport Cruises Inc., M/V Ocean Journey. (emt, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Heidt, Janice)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form - Consent To Jurisdiction By United States Magistrate Judge)(cib)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). The party filing the case is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice of Assignment and the attached Election Form.
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 3/25/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00032-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sea Sport Cruises Inc, M/V Ocean Journey ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2145864.), filed by David Kuntz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heidt, Janice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuntz et al v. Sea Sport Cruises Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Sport Cruises Inc. dba Pacific Whale Foundation Eco Adventure Tours In Personam and M/V Ocean Journey In Rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Ocean Journey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Sport Cruises Inc.
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. David Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Rita Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kuntz
Represented By: Richard A. Lesser
Represented By: Janice D. Heidt
Represented By: Rai Saint Chu
Represented By: Richard Turbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Kuntz
Represented By: Richard A. Lesser
Represented By: Janice D. Heidt
Represented By: Rai Saint Chu
Represented By: Richard Turbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?