Lapthorne v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Gus D. Lapthorne, Leneen Kron, Robert Kron, Reginald K. Valle, Jr., Samantha J. Arruiza-Valle and Brandy L. Lapthorne
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A., Susan Bear, Quicken Loans, Inc., Doe Defendants 1-50, Douglas Bear, Amerisave Mortgage Corporation, David G. Kenney, American Savings Bank, F.S.B., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Mark Onnagan, Erik M. Jennings, Nicole S. Bear, Kathleen Alice Kenney and Tawny-Ann Maculam Onnagan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00048
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 EP: FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE held.Discussion held. Parties state their positions on settlement discussions.Counsel James J. Bickerton is excused.(SEALED 1:44 - 1:57)Initial settlement discussion held between the Court and PNC Bank with furtherdiscussions to be held next week.2:00 - 2:30Initial settlement discussion held with Plaintiff's counsel. (FTR-Ctrm C6 1:30 - 2:30.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 PNC Bank, National Association's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chun, Lauren)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: The Court continues the hearing on #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Remand to 5/16/2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Opposition is due April 11, 2019. Reply is due April 18, 2019 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield1)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING: The Court sets a hearing on #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Remand at 10:00 AM on 4/3/2019, in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Opposition is due 3/18/2019. Reply is due 3/25/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield1)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE as to BRETT J. NATARELLI, ESQ. re: #14 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/1/2019. BRETT J. NATARELLI, ESQ. (Law Firm: Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendant PNC BANK, N.A. (jo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Brett J. Natarelli. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2163972.Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Reid Davis as to Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. re #10 .Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/26/2019. (cib)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Arthur F. Radke as to Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. re #8 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/26/2019. (cib)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand MOTION FOR ORDER OF REMAND James J. Bickerton appearing for Plaintiffs Samantha J. Arruiza-Valle, Leneen Kron, Robert Kron, Brandy L. Lapthorne, Gus D. Lapthorne, Reginald K. Valle, Jr (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of James J. Bickerton, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LR 7.5(e), #33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Bickerton, James)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Reid Davis] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2163154.Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 EP: STATUS CONFERENCE held. Arthur F. Radke, PHV counsel only in 1:19-cv-00006-JMS-KJM, via telephone. Discussion held regarding how the parties intend to proceed. Further Status Conference is set for March 15, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:15 - 9:33.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Arthur F. Radke Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2163025.Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard E. Gottlieb as to Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. re #5 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/22/2019. (cib)
February 21, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the docket number #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Richard E. Gottlieb filed by PNC Bank, N.A. shall be submitted by e-mail to Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield(mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov) for consideration. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations, LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (cib)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 03/04/2019 at 9:30 a.m. has been advanced and converted into a Status Conference set for 02/25/2019 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. At this time, the parties need not meet and confer nor file any conference statements. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Richard E. Gottlieb Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2160803.Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 3/4/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00048 SOM-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNC Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent PNC Financial Services Group for PNC Bank, N.A... (Chun, Lauren)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PNC Bank, N.A. from Second Circuit Court, case number 18-1-0484(1). ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2148303), filed by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Chun, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Certificate of Service)(Chun, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lapthorne v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lauren K. Chun
Represented By: Brett J. Natarelli
Represented By: Reid Davis
Represented By: Richard E. Gottlieb
Represented By: Edmund K. Saffery
Represented By: Arthur F. Radke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Bear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Bear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisave Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Savings Bank, F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Onnagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik M. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole S. Bear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Alice Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tawny-Ann Maculam Onnagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gus D. Lapthorne
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leneen Kron
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kron
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald K. Valle, Jr.
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha J. Arruiza-Valle
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy L. Lapthorne
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?