Kamoku v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Coralee L. Kamoku
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00069
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Moriyama on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Moriyama, Rachel)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill (jo)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re: #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/11/2019. (jo)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00069-ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Diane C. Haar appearing for Plaintiff Coralee L. Kamoku (Haar, Diane)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Haar, Diane)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Coralee L. Kamoku against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Coralee L. Kamoku. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haar, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kamoku v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coralee L. Kamoku
Represented By: Diane C. Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?