Endean v. Gulick
Plaintiff: Paul Russell Endean
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Lee Francis Cissna, Christopher M. Robinson and David G. Gulick
Case Number: 1:2019cv00078
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 24 EO: In light of the #23 Notice of Dismissal, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 04/15/2019 is hereby VACATED. Counsel Fernando L. Cosio to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 4, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Dismissal Paul Russell Endean. (Cosio, Fernando)
March 6, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Russell Endean. Kirsten Nielsen served by mail on 2/19/2019. Paul Russell Endean. (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 3/7/2019 (jo)
March 6, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Russell Endean. Lee Francis Cissna served by mail on 2/19/2019 Paul Russell Endean. (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 3/7/2019 (jo)
March 6, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Russell Endean. Christopher M. Robinson served on 2/19/2019 through Heith M. Kaneshige, Esq. Paul Russell Endean. (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 3/7/2019 (jo)
March 6, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Russell Endean. David M. Gulick served on 2/19/2019 through Ann Yuuki, Paralegal, U.S. Attorney's Office. Paul Russell Endean. (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 3/7/2019 (jo)
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Russell Endean. Christopher M. Robinson served on 2/19/2019 through Ann Yuuki, Paralegal, US Attorney's Office. Paul Russell Endean. (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 3/7/2019 (jo)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Defendant KIRSTEN M. NIELSEN served on 2/19/2019 through Ann Yuuki, US Attorney's Office by Paul Russell Endean. All Plaintiffs. (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 2/25/2019 (jo)
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Defendant DAVID M. GULICK served on 2/19/2019 through Heith M. Kaneshige, Esq. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Russell Endean (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 2/25/2019 (jo)
February 20, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Defendant LEE FRANCIS CISSNA served on 2/19/2019 through Ann Yuuki, US Attorney's Office CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Russell Endean (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 2/21/2019 (jo)
February 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Paul Russell Endean Paul Russell Endean. (Cosio, Fernando)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Paul Russell Endean.(Cosio, Fernando)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Defendant Lee Francis Cissna (jo)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Defendant Christopher M. Robinson (jo)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Defendant Kirstjen M. Nielsen (jo)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Cosio, Fernando)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Cosio, Fernando)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Cosio, Fernando)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISRTATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. Do not e-file the Election Form. After completing the form, parties can either email it to consent@hid.uscourts.gov, or mail it to U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd., Room C-338, Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov. (jo)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 4/15/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Defendant David G. Gulick (jo)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR REVIEW - filed by Plaintiff Paul Russell Endean (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Coversheet) (jo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2019: #5 Filing Fee Receipt #HI025829) (jo)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00078 KJM on all further pleadings (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endean v. Gulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Russell Endean
Represented By: Fernando L. Cosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Gulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?