Greys Avenue Partners, LLC; et al. vs. Coupe
Plaintiff: Castle Resorts & Hotels, Inc. and Greys Avenue Partners, LLC
Defendant: Aaron Coupe and Colin Theyers
Case Number: 1:2019cv00079
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 EO: Counsel informs the Court that Defendant Colin Theyers is a resident in New Zealand are in the process of discussion settlement. For good cause show, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 05/13/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 06/10/2019 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 06/03/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 EO: It does not appear that Plaintiffs Greys Avenue Partners, LLC and Castle Resorts & Hotels, Inc. have served Defendant Colin Theyers the Complaint filed on 02/13/2019. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to 09:30 AM on 5/13/2019, in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference Statements are due on 05/06/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield1)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Dismissal Of All Claims Against Defendant Aaron Coupe by Plaintiffs Castle Resorts & Hotels, Inc. and Greys Avenue Partners, LLC. (Ruthruff, Jerry)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/15/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00079 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2157445.), filed by greys avenue partners, llc.(Ruthruff, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greys Avenue Partners, LLC; et al. vs. Coupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Castle Resorts & Hotels, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry A. Ruthruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greys Avenue Partners, LLC
Represented By: Jerry A. Ruthruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Coupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Theyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?