United States of America v. Almonte

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Geraldine Almonte
Case Number: 1:2019cv00093
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiff's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 04/22/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 6/10/2019, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 06/03/2019.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (mansfield2)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendant Geraldine Almonte (jo)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/22/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00093 ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geraldine Almonte, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moriyama, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?