Coyaso v. 3M Company et al

Plaintiff: Achique Coyaso
Defendant: Aearo, LLC, Aearo Holdings, LLC, 3M Company, Aearo Techonologies, LLC and Aearo Intermediate, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00097
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER dated April 15, 2019 transferring this case to the USDC for the Northern District of Florida pursuant to MDL Docket No. 2885. Signed and sealed by John W. Nicols, Clerk of the Panel. (cib)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION To Extend The Deadline For Defendants To Respond To The Complaint Filed on February 25, 2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/4/2019. (cib)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aearo Techonologies, LLC. served on 3/14/2019 filed by Achique Coyaso. (Faria, Brandee) Modified on 4/4/2019 to add service date to docket text (cib).
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aearo, LLC. served on 3/14/2019 filed by Achique Coyaso. (Faria, Brandee) Modified on 4/4/2019 to add service date to docket text (cib).
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aearo Intermediate, LLC. served on 3/14/2019 filed by Achique Coyaso. (Faria, Brandee) Modified on 4/4/2019 to add service date to docket text (cib).
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aearo Holdings, LLC served on 3/14/2019 filed by Achique Coyaso.(Faria, Brandee) Modified on 4/4/2019 to add service date to docket text (cib).
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to 3M Company served on 4/3/2019 filed by Achique Coyaso. (Faria, Brandee) Modified on 4/4/2019 to add service date to docket text (cib).
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00,receipt number HI025914 re #1 Complaint. (cib)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/29/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
February 26, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Achique Coyaso was filed incorrectly in this case. Please be advised that the complaint is not signed by the e-filer, John Perkin, Esq. The filing party may refer to LR100.5.1., which states "The name of the CM/ECF user under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear (e.g. /s/ John or Jane Lawyer)." (emt, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00097 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Achique Coyaso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Summons)(Perkin, John) Modified on 2/26/2019 This document is signed by Brandee J. K. Faria, Esq. but is e-filed using the CM/ECF login credentials of John Perkin, Esq. (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coyaso v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Achique Coyaso
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Wade
Represented By: Brandee J. Faria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Techonologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Intermediate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?