Hawkins v. Fisher
Plaintiff: Clarence Elroy Hawkins, Jr.
Defendant: Pamela Fisher
Case Number: 1:2019cv00102
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 EO: In light of #6 Order Adopting Magistrate Judge's #5 Findings and Recommendation to: (1) Dismiss Complaint with Leave to Amend; and (2) Deny Plaintiff's Request to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, the Court continues the 04/29/2019, 9:30 a.m. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to 09:30 a.m. on 8/1/2019, in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements shall be submitted no later than 07/25/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield1)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO: (1) DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND (2) DENY PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS (ECF NO. #5 ) AS MODIFIED - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 4/15/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Clarence Elroy Hawkins, Jr. served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on April 16, 2019. A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO 240) shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Hawkins.
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO: (1) DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re #1 , #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/29/2019. Based upon the foregoing, the Court FINDS AND RECOMMENDS that the district court: 1. DISMISS the Complaint WITH LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT curing the deficiencies identified above no later than thirty (30) days from an order adopting this Findings and Recommendation; 2. DENY Plaintiff's IFP Application with leave to file another application if he chooses to file an amended complaint; and 3. DIRECT the Clerk's Office to send Plaintiff a copy of this district court's Form AO 240 (Rev. 07/10) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Clarence Elroy Hawkins, Jr. served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on March 29, 2019. A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO 240) shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Hawkins.
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/29/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION in Support of Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - by Plaintiff Clarence Elroy Hawkins, Jr. (emt, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Clarence Elroy Hawkins, Jr. (emt, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pamela Fisher - filed by Clarence Elroy Hawkins, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Article 1: Toxicology chart & Toxic metals found at Camp Lejeune, #2 Article 2: V.A. Hearing, #3 Article 3: FTCA Form (RESTRICTED), #4 Article 4: An Admitting of the V.A.'s failure to help (RESTRICTED) , #5 Article 5: Psychologist exam transcripts and diagnosis (RESTRICTED) , #6 Article 6: Manifesto: Mr. President) (emt, ) Modified on 3/1/2019 to restrict certain exhibits due to the disclosure of personal identifiers (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2019: #7 Article 3: FTCA Form (redacted), #8 Article 4: An Admitting of the V.A.'s failure to help (redacted), #9 Article 5: Psychologist exam transcripts and diagnosis (redacted)) (emt, ). Modified on 3/4/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Elroy Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?