Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds v. Ono Construction, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Vacation & Holiday Fund, Annuity Fund, Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET), Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Pension Fund, Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds and Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: Harry James Cornish and Ono Construction, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00109
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 EO: In light of the #10 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendants Ono Construction, LLC, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company, and Harry James Cornish, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 05/06/2019 is hereby VACATED. Plaintiff shall seek default judgment no later than May 13, 2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendants Ono Construction, LLC, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company, and Harry James Cornish, individually re ECF No. #9 . (emt, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST Entry of Default by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Exhibit A, #3 [Proposed] Entry of Default)(Ikeda, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. Harry James Cornish served on 3/14/2019 . (Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 3/20/2019 (emt, ).
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. Ono Construction, LLC. 3/14/2019. (Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 3/20/2019 (emt, ).
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cib)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 5/6/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00109-JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2166924.), filed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds v. Ono Construction, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry James Cornish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ono Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vacation & Holiday Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annuity Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET)
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?