Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. BCP Construction of Hawaii, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Defendant: Robert N. Close, Legacy One Development, LLC, Close Family Trust, Betty Close and BCP Construction of Hawaii, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00140
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 44 EP: Settlement Conference held. Case did not settle. Settlement discussions ongoing. (In chambers - not reported) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) (Manaut, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America RE: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF FIRST HAWAIIAN BANK UPON WRITTEN QUESTIONS (Wesley-Smith, Ian)
June 17, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America's Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of Legacy One Development; Exhibit A (Manaut, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America's Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of BCP Construction of Hawaii, Inc.; Exhibit A (Manaut, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America's Notice of Deposition of Robert N. Close, Trustee of the Close Family Trust (Manaut, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 38 Return of Service on Subpoena First Hawaiian Bank was served on 6/10/19 (Wesley-Smith, Ian)
June 10, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America re #36 Certificate of Service First Amended Certificate of Service Re Plaintiff's Notice of Taking Deposition of Custodian of Records of First Hawaiian Bank Upon Written Questions (Wesley-Smith, Ian)
June 7, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Plaintiff's Notice of Taking Deposition of Custodian of Records of First Hawaiian Bank Upon Written Questions (Wesley-Smith, Ian)
June 7, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian R. Wesley-Smith on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wesley-Smith, Ian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Notice of Deposition of Robert N. Close, Trustee of the Close Family Trust (Manaut, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of Legacy One Development, LLC; Exhibit A (Manaut, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of BCP Construction of Hawaii, Inc.; Exhibit A (Manaut, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Request for Production of Documents to Defendant BCP Construction of Hawaii, Inc. (Set One) (Manaut, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Legacy One Development, LLC (Set One) (Manaut, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Betty Close (Set One) (Manaut, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Robert N. Close (Set One) (Manaut, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Close Family Trust (Set One) (Manaut, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Interrogatories to Defendant BCP Construction of Hawaii Inc. (Set One) (Manaut, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Interrogatories to Defendant Legacy One Development LLC (Set One) (Manaut, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Interrogatories to Defendant Betty Close (Set One) (Manaut, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Interrogatories to Defendant Robert N. Close (Set One) (Manaut, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Re Interrogatories to Defendant Close Family Trust (Set One) (Manaut, John)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/13/2019. (emt, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued.Jury Selection/Trial is set for 05/26/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 04/14/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 07/08/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Dispositive Motions filed by 01/10/2020. Discovery due by 03/27/2020. Plaintiff request for order to submit to a debtor exam by June 15, 2019. The Court is inclined to order that the defendant submit to a debtor exam prior to the settlement. Mr. Markham to seek authority. If authorized to do so, the parties shall submit a Stipulation for this Court's review and approval.(In Chambers - not reported 9:00 - 9:10.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(bbb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Markham, Ryan)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00140DKW-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/19 ). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 05/08/2019. (apg, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Manaut, John)
May 6, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Manaut, John)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by BCP Construction of Hawaii, Inc., Betty Close, Robert N. Close, Close Family Trust, Legacy One Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Markham, Ryan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Robert N. Close, as Trustee of the Close Family Trust served on 3/22/2019 . (Manaut, John) Modified on 3/29/2019 (emt, ).
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Robert N. Close served on 3/22/2019 . (Manaut, John) Modified on 3/29/2019 (emt, ).
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Close Family Trust served on 3/22/2019 . (Manaut, John) Modified on 3/29/2019 (emt, ).
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Legacy One Development, LLC served on 3/22/2019 . (Manaut, John) Modified on 3/29/2019 (emt, ).
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. BCP Construction of Hawaii, Inc. served on 3/22/2019 . (Manaut, John) Modified on 3/29/2019 (emt, ).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING THE APPLICATIONS OF ROBERT C. NIESLEY AND REBECCA S. GLOS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #7 , #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 3/19/2019. (emt, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca S. Glos Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2173518.John P. Manaut appearing for Plaintiff Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Manaut, John)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Robert C. Niesley Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2173516.John P. Manaut appearing for Plaintiff Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Manaut, John)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/13/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00140 DKW-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The St. Paul Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.. (Manaut, John)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America's Complaint for (1) Breach of Contract (2) Quia Timet; (3) Unjust Enrichment (4) Declaratory Relief; and (5) Specific Performance against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2172863.), filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A General Agreement of Indemnity, #2 Exhibit B Performance Bond, #3 Exhibit C February 14, 2019 Collateral Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit D UCC-1 Filings, #5 Demand for Jury Trial, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Manaut, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. BCP Construction of Hawaii, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert N. Close
Represented By: Ryan K. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy One Development, LLC
Represented By: Ryan K. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Close Family Trust
Represented By: Ryan K. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Close
Represented By: Ryan K. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCP Construction of Hawaii, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan K. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: John P. Manaut
Represented By: Rebecca S. Glos
Represented By: Robert C. Niesley
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?