GemCap Lending I, LLC v. Van Buren

Plaintiff: GemCap Lending I, LLC
Defendant: George W. Van Buren
Case Number: 1:2019cv00142
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 EO: In light of #23 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(I), Defendant George Van Buren's Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice is terminated and the hearing on that Motion set for 6/12/2019 is VACATED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Dismissal GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, Christine)
June 5, 2019 Filing 24 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: ORDER DENYING TRANSFER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (emt, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Plaintiff Gemcap Lending I, LLC's Opposition to Defendant George Van Buren's Motion to Dismiss filed by George W. Van Buren. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chun, Robyn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, Christine)
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the law firm of Duane Morris on behalf of Defendant George Van Buren - Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument, HI/1:19-cv-142 (re regarding transfer of case to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument, CAN/4:18-cv-5979, #2 Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument/MDL No. 2892, #3 Transmittal Letter, dated May 13, 2019) (emt, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 EO: Due to the pending motion to dismiss which is set for hearing on 6/12/19, the Court reschedules, by agreement of counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to 09:00AM on 7/3/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 6/26/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 18 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the law firm of Duane Morris LLP on behalf of George Van Buren: George Van Buren's Opposition to GemCap Lending I, LLC's Motion for Transfer and Coordination Pursuant to 28 USC 1407 (HI/1:1-cv-142) (Attachments: #1 George Van Buren's Opposition to GemCap Lending I, LLC's Motion for Transfer and Coordination Pursuant to 28 USC 1407 (CAN/4:18-cv-5979), #2 George Van Buren's Opposition to GemCcap Lending I, LLC's Motion for Transfer and Coordination Pursuant to 28 USC 1407 (MDL 2892), #3 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 EO: The hearing on #14 Defendant George Van Buren's Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice set for 8/9/2019 is ADVANCED to 6/12/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Derrick K. Watson. The briefing schedule for this motion is governed by the Local Rules, based on the new hearing date of 6/12/2019. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing on #14 Defendant George Van Buren's Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice set for 8/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (tyk)
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Robyn B. Chun appearing for Defendant George W. Van Buren (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Robyn B. Chun, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Certificate of Service)(Chun, Robyn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the law firm of Duane Morris LLP on behalf of George Van Buren regarding transfer of case to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GemCap Lending I, LLC re #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Amended) (Ryan, Christine)
April 10, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #12 Certificate of Service filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC was filed incorrectly in this case. Please be advised that the document is signed by someone other than the e-filer. LR100.5.1. states "The name of the CM/ECF user under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear (e.g., /s/ John or Jane Lawyer)". (emt, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GemCap Lending I, LLC re #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ryan, Christine)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Ryan, Christine)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS Returned Executed by GemCap Lending I, LLC. George W. Van Buren served through "sub-serving" per telephone and email agreement on April 1, 2019. (emt, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS regarding transfer of case to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation: Plaintiff's Schedule of Actions for Transfer and Coordination Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 submitted by the law firm of Nossaman LLP on behalf of Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer and Coordination Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, #2 Brief in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proof of Service, #6 Amended Proof of Service, #7 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
March 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by GemCap Lending I, LLC as to George W. Van Buren. (emt, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS regarding transfer of case to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation: Plaintiff's Schedule of Actions for Transfer and Coordination Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 submitted by the law firm of Nossaman LLP on behalf of Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Motion for Transfer and Coordination Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, #2 Brief in Support of Motion, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/20/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to George W. Van Buren. (emt, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00142 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Ryan, Christine)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George W. Van Buren ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2174459.), filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ryan, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GemCap Lending I, LLC v. Van Buren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Van Buren
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GemCap Lending I, LLC
Represented By: Christine Desiree Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?